IL SB1485 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-20 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-20 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Requires the Planning and Procurement Bureau to establish a long-term renewable resources procurement plan that includes all renewable energy credits necessary to meet specified goals (replacing the current renewable portfolio standards). Sets forth guidelines for what shall be included in the procurement plan. Makes changes to provisions concerning definitions, the powers of the Agency, the Illinois Power Agency Renewable Energy Resources Fund, and the duties of the Planning and Procurement Bureau. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes changes concerning nondiscrimination, energy efficiency and demand-response measures, natural gas efficiency programs, real-time pricing, infrastructure investment and modernization, the Illinois Smart Grid test bed, and on-bill financing programs for electric and gas utilities. Adds provisions related to renewable energy credit procurement. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that upon promulgation by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency of a final rule regulating carbon dioxide emissions from existing electric generating units, the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency shall be authorized to implement a cap and invest program or similar market mechanism to regulate carbon dioxide emissions. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
RENEWABLE RESOURCE PROCUREMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-001-001 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5C | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-115D | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 19-140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |