IL SB1504 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Optometric Practice Act of 1987. Removes provisions allowing for a limited one year optometry practice license for applicants in a residency program. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to audit applicants within 12 months of renewal of license to ensure compliance with continuing education requirements, unless other means are used to verify total compliance. Allows the use of testimonials in advertisements of optometric services. Allows licensees to use the words "hospital", "school", and "university" in connection with the place where optometry may be practiced or demonstrated if the licensee is employed by and practicing at a location that is licensed as a hospital or accredited as a school or university. Makes other changes.
Title
OPTOMETRY ACT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] |
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Steven Andersson [R] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0043 |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-04-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 80 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 80 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 80 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 80 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |