IL SB1504 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Deletes language providing that if an attorney files an appearance on behalf of a person whose fees, costs, and charges were initially waived, the attorney must pay all fees, costs, and charges relating to the civil action, including any previously waived fees, costs, and charges, unless the attorney is either a civil legal services provider, representing his or her client as part of a court-sponsored pro bono program as, or appearing under a limited scope appearance. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV PRO-COSTS-WAIVER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0036 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Effective Date June 28, 2019 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 5-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |