IL SB1569 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employment of Teachers Article of the School Code. Provides that if an employing board determines to dismiss any teacher who currently holds a summative evaluation rating of "Proficient" or "Excellent" during the probationary period (instead of determines to dismiss a teacher in the last year of a specified probationary period), the employing board must provide a written notice for dismissal with specific reasons for dismissal. Provides that any full-time teacher who does not receive written notice from the employing board at least 45 days before the end of any school term and whose performance does not require dismissal (instead of whose performance does not require dismissal after the fourth probationary year) shall be re-employed for the following school term. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHER DISMISSAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1569&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1569.htm |