IL SB1575 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning eavesdropping exemptions. Provides that a person who is not a law enforcement officer nor acting at the direction of a law enforcement officer may record the conversation of a law enforcement officer who is performing a public duty in a public place and any other person who is having a conversation with that law enforcement officer if the conversation is at a volume audible to the unassisted ear of the person who is making the recording. Defines "public place". Amends the State Police Act and the Uniform Peace Officers' Disciplinary Act. Provides that if a recorded conversation authorized under this exemption to the eavesdropping statute is used by the complainant as part of the evidence of misconduct against the officer and is found to have been intentionally altered by or at the direction of the complainant to inaccurately reflect the incident at issue, it must be presented to the appropriate State's Attorney for a determination of prosecution. Effective immediately.
Title
RECORDING LAW ENFORCEMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 725 | 3.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 14-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1575&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1575.htm |