IL SB1576 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusts appropriations to the General Assembly budget for the 2011 fiscal year. Effective immediately.
Title
$GENERAL ASSEMBLY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2011 |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2011 |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Appropriations II; 010-000-000 |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |