IL SB1599 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $600,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for a business development grant to Robert's Sysco Food Services for all costs associated with the construction of a distribution facility in Lincoln including all prior costs incurred. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$DCEO
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Bomke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Appropriations II | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Larry K. Bomke |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1599&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/PDF/09600SB1599.pdf |