IL SB1599 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the portion of a site or facility that collects, separates, stores, or converts post-use polymers into crude oil, fuels, or other valuable final or intermediate products using a pyrolysis process is not a pollution control facility under the Act. Defines "post-use polymers" and "pyrolysis". Makes changes to the definition for "municipal waste incineration" in provisions concerning municipal waste incineration emission standards. Limits the concurrent exercise of power by home rule units. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
POLLUTION CONTROL FACILITY
Sponsors
Sen. Pat McGuire [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 22.16b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.330 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.336 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.366 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.535 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 47.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 9.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1599&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1599.htm |