IL SB1624 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that only particular portions of specified meetings under the Abuse Prevention Review Team Act, Developmental Disability and Mental Health Safety Act, and Department of Juvenile Justice Mortality Review Team Act (rather than all of the specified meetings under those Acts) may be closed to the public. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that only particular portions (rather than all) of the records and information maintained or provided by certain entities under the Abuse Prevention Review Team Act, Developmental Disability and Mental Health Safety Act, and Department of Juvenile Justice Mortality Review Team Act are exempt from disclosure. Amends the Abuse Prevention Review Team Act, Developmental Disability and Mental Health Safety Act, and Department of Juvenile Justice Mortality Review Team Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FOIA/OMA-DEATH REVIEW TEAMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 002-000-000 |
2011-03-03 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 28 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
405 | 82 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 195 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1624&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1624.htm |