IL SB1648 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Further amends the Illinois Pension Code. In the State Employees Articles of the Code, provides that a Tier 2 employee whose disability continues but whose disability benefit is terminated due to attaining age 65 or terminated after 5 years because the ordinary disability benefit commenced after age 60 shall immediately qualify to begin receiving a Tier 2 retirement annuity without reduction due to age if the employee has earned at least 10 years of service credit.
Title
PEN CD-CHI LABORERS-ANNUITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0553 |
2023-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date August 11, 2023 |
2023-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Senate Special Committee on Pensions |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 16, 2023 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-05-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-037-001 |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-05-12 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-002-000 |
2023-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2023-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-003-000 |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2023-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Do Pass Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 11-159 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 11-159.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |