IL SB1653 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Departments of State Government Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that notwithstanding any law to the contrary, third-party contracts entered into by the State are permissible only when they are in the best interests of the State. Provides conditions with which to measure whether a third-party contract is in the best interests of the State. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE THIRD PARTY CONTRACTS
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] |
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 011-005-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1653&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1653.htm |