IL SB1673 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Prohibits campaign contributions to General Assembly members from recipients of their legislative member initiatives for 5 years after initial disbursement of moneys. Amends the Governor's Office of Management and Budget Act. Requires GOMB to establish a single updated searchable database website accessible by the public at no cost that includes information concerning each entity that receives Illinois funding. Requires GOMB to report to the General Assembly concerning the website. Effective immediately.
Title
GOMB-FUNDS-TRANSPARENT WEBSITE
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2013-02-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-8.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3005 | 9.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1673&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1673.htm |