IL SB1673 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Extends a provision concerning Environmental Protection Agency fast-track rulemaking from December 31, 2014 to December 31, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-FAST-TRACK RULEMAKING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-11-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler |
2016-11-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - December 1, 2016 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2016-11-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2016-11-30 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-11-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-000-000 |
2016-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-11-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2015-12-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-07-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015 |
2015-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2015-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-05-18 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 28.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |