IL SB1682 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that of the 4 participating employee members of the Board of Trustees, one of the members must be from a community college.
Title
PEN CD-SURS-BOARD MEMBERSHIP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 15-159 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1682&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1682.htm |