IL SB1684 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Creates an advisory council on pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorder associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute neuropsychiatric syndrome to advise the Director of Public Health on research, diagnosis, treatment, and education relating to the disorder and syndrome. Sets forth the membership of the council. Designates the Director of Public Health, or his or her designee, as chair of the council. Requires the council, by January 1, 2017 and annually thereafter, to issue a report to the General Assembly with recommendations concerning practice guidelines, mechanisms to increase clinical awareness, outreach to educators and parents, and development of a network of volunteer experts on pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorder associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute neuropsychiatric syndrome.
Title
PUBLIC HEALTH-ADVISORY COUNCIL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-07 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0320 |
2015-08-07 | Senate | Effective Date August 7, 2015 |
2015-08-07 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2015 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2015-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-001 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |