IL SB1716 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Registered Surgical Assistant and Registered Surgical Technologist Title Protection Act. Provides that all applicants and registrants shall: (1) provide a valid address and email address to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, which shall serve as the address of record and email address of record, respectively, at the time of application for registration or renewal of a registration; and (2) inform the Department of any change of address of record or email address of record within 14 days after such change. Provides that the Secretary (rather than the Department) shall observe the rehearing proceedings. Provides that in a denial for a rehearing, the Secretary may enter an order in accordance with the recommendations of the hearing officer (rather than the Department). Provides that the hearing officer shall report the hearing officer's findings of fact, conclusions of law, and recommendations to the Secretary (rather than the Department). Removes a provision providing that exhibits shall be certified without cost. Makes corresponding and other changes. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Repeals the Registered Surgical Assistant and Registered Surgical Technologist Title Protection Act on January 1, 2029 (rather than January 1, 2024). Provisions amending the Regulatory Sunset Act are effective immediately.
Title
SURG ASSIST/TECH TITLE-MISC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0387 |
2023-07-28 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024; Some Provisions |
2023-07-28 | Senate | Effective Date July 28, 2023; Some Provisions |
2023-07-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities |
2023-05-17 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-17 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2023 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-12 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Glowiak Hilton |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 130 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 130 | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 130 | 115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 130 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 130 | 120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 130 | 150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 130 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 130 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 130 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 130 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |