IL SB1717 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan Act. Provides that the insurance operations of the Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan authorized by the Act shall cease on January 1, 2014 and that Plan coverage does not apply to service provided on or after January 1, 2014. Provides for the repeal of the Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan Act on January 1, 2015. Amends the Illinois Health Benefits Exchange Law. Makes changes concerning the legislative intent of the Law. Sets forth definitions. Establishes the Illinois Health Benefits Exchange as a political subdivision, body politic and corporate. Provides that the Exchange shall be a public entity, but shall not be considered a department, institution, or agency of the State. Sets forth a provision concerning the certification of health benefit plans. Deletes references to the Illinois Health Benefits Exchange Legislative Study Committee and establishes instead the Illinois Health Benefits Exchange Legislative Oversight Committee within the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability. Provides that the governing and administrative powers of the Exchange shall be vested in a body known as the Illinois Health Benefits Exchange Board and sets forth provisions concerning appointments, terms, meetings, structure, recusal, budget, and purpose. Sets forth provisions concerning enrollment through brokers and agents and producer compensation. Effective immediately.
Title
CHIP CEASE-HEALTH EXCHANGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-02-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 105 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 105 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 122 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 122 | 5-16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 122 | 5-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 122 | 5-21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 122 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 122 | 5-4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 122 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 122 | 5-6 | New Code | See Bill Text |