IL SB1744 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-27 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Response) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-27 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Response) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State aid formula provisions of the School Code. With respect to the compilation of average daily attendance, removes a provision allowing days of attendance to be less than 5 clock hours on the opening and closing of the school term and upon the first day of pupil attendance if preceded by a day or days utilized as an institute or teachers' workshop. Effective June 30, 2011.
Title
SCH CD-STATE AID-ATTENDANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-27 | Senate | Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Assignments |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Education |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Assignments |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 25, 2011 |
2011-07-29 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2011-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-06 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2011-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | First Reading |
2011-03-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2011 |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 008-001-001 |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 18-8.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |