IL SB1745 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Provides that, in counties in which the Court Appointed Special Advocates provide services, a county board may adopt a mandatory assessment between $10 and $30 to be paid by defendants found guilty of offenses requiring a court appearance. Provides that this assessment is in addition to any other assessment that may be imposed under the Act. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
CASA-COUNTY ASSESSMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Civil Rights |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1745&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1745.htm |