IL SB1763 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Expands the definition of "abused child" to include a child abused by a professional working with the child in his or her professional capacity who inflicts corporal punishment. Expands the definition of "neglected child" to include a child who is subjected to an environment which is injurious insofar as (i) the child's environment creates a likelihood of harm to the child's health, physical well-being, or welfare and (ii) the likely harm to the child is the result of the conduct of a professional who, while working in his or her professional capacity with the child, neglects his or her professional responsibilities or engages in conduct that is contrary to his or her professional responsibilities. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to adopt rules, by January 1, 2016, that address and set forth criteria and standards relevant to (1) investigations of reports of abuse or neglect committed by professionals working with children or adult residents in their professional capacity; and (2) investigations of allegations of harm to children or adult residents who are in child care facilities licensed by the Department under the Child Care Act of 1969, transitional living programs, or unlicensed foster homes. Provides that the Department is authorized and required to release information from unfounded reports as necessary in its determination to protect children and adult residents who are in child care facilities licensed by the Department under the Child Care Act of 1969.
Title
DCFS-ABUSED KIDS-PROFESSIONAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0350 |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date June 1, 2016; Some portions effective |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016; Some portions effective |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-05-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-05-11 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-04-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Morrison |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Morrison |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 7.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |