IL SB1803 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sand Mine and Transportation Study Act. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall conduct a sand mine and transportation study on the effects of sand mine operations in LaSalle county and its bordering counties, and produce a report on its findings. Allows the Department to consult with other agencies to carry out its purposes. Requires the Department to submit its report by January 1, 2016. Contains a repealer provision. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT-SAND MINE STUDY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0400 |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date August 18, 2015 |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 016-000-000 |
2015-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rezin |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 012-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |