IL SB1845 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the owner of a certificate of purchase must file with the county clerk the names and addresses of the owners of the property and those persons entitled to service of notice at their last known addresses. Provides that the clerk shall mail notice within 30 days from the date of the filing of addresses with the clerk.
Title
PROP TX-NOTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0528 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 016-000-001 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |