IL SB1850 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows multiple suspensions and revocations to exist simultaneously on a driver's license. Allows for graduated penalties for multiple violations if any of the prior convictions were a result of the driver's license being suspended for the same underlying offense as the present violation.
Title
MULTIPLE DL SUSP/REVOCATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1850&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1850.htm |