IL SB1855 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Adds first degree murder to the list of offenses for which certain out of court statements are admissible as an exception to the hearsay rule in a prosecution for a physical or sexual act perpetrated upon or against a child under the age of 13, or a person who was a moderately, severely, or profoundly intellectually disabled person. Allows as an exception to the hearsay rule an out of court statement of a child witness under the age of 13 (rather than limited to the child victim under the age of 13) describing any complaint of such act or matter or detail pertaining to any act which is an element of an offense which is the subject of a prosecution for a sexual or physical act against that victim, and describing a sexual or physical act performed by the accused on or with any person if admissible under the Section of this Code regarding evidence in certain cases or certain character evidence under the Illinois Rules of Evidence.
Title
CRIM PRO - HEARSAY EXCEPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 115-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |