IL SB1875 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. In provisions concerning general, emergency, and peremptory rulemaking, specifies that State agencies shall accept submissions in writing, including submissions by email, and may, in their discretion, accept oral submissions. Requires each summary in a regulatory agenda to contain, among other things, the email address of the agency representative who is knowledgeable about the rule. Amends the Uniform Electronic Transactions Act. Requires the Department of Innovation and Technology and the Secretary of State to adopt specified administrative rules concerning electronic records no later than 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
JCAR-RULEMAKING SUBMISSIONS
Sponsors
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0390 |
2023-07-28 | Senate | Effective Date July 28, 2023 |
2023-07-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-05-17 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 16, 2023 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2023-05-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2023-05-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-05-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-05-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2023-04-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 5-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 333 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |