IL SB1892 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Requires the Illinois Department of Transportation to delegate to the Region Engineer of any region which contains a county with a population of 3,000,000 or more inhabitants, the authority to control all phases of soil management on Department projects within the region. Provides that the Region Engineer shall provide recommendations to the Department's procurement officer regarding the use of prequalified environmental engineering firms within the region for the purpose of performing soil management work.
Title
HWY CD-PROJ SOIL MGMT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1892&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1892.htm |