IL SB1952 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Labor Arbitration Services Act. Amends the Department of Labor Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois by providing that, if the Department of Labor began providing arbitration services with respect to a particular controversy or difference under the Labor Arbitration Services Act before its repeal, the Department may continue to provide arbitration services for the resolution of that controversy or difference in accordance with the Labor Arbitration Services Act as it existed immediately before its repeal. Effective immediately.
Title
LABOR ARBITRATION SERV-REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-22 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0190 |
2011-07-22 | Senate | Effective Date July 22, 2011 |
2011-07-22 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-005-002 |
2011-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor Committee; 019-000-000 |
2011-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2011-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 010-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1505 | 1505-130 | New Code | See Bill Text |
710 | 10 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |