IL SB1977 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code, the Childhood Hunger Relief Act, the School Safety Drill Act, and the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Makes changes concerning a teacher supply and demand report, school standards, recognition levels, academic early warning and watch status, a Data Division, truants' alternative and optional education programs, the School Technology Revolving Loan Program, the inspection and review of school facilities, programs concerning services to at-risk children and their families, the inspection of schools, a report of teacher dismissals, the tuition of children from orphanages and children's homes, dates for filing State aid claims, truant data, safety education, driver education, the evaluation of charter school proposals, a summer food service program, a school safety review, and the administration of certain federal scholarship programs. Repeals provisions concerning discontinued institutions, racial reports, and a course on the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals the Educationally Disadvantaged Children Article of the School Code. Repeals the Sex Education Act and the Recognized Normal School Act. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
SCH CD-MISCELLANEOUS
Sponsors
Sen. James Meeks [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0734 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date August 25, 2009 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education | |
2009-05-20 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-20 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James T. Meeks | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 20, 2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 020-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 2, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James T. Meeks |