IL SB2010 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Fertilizer Act of 1961. Makes changes to the definitions. Provides for labeling requirements for fertilizers or custom blends. Provides that it shall be unlawful for misbranding or for the adulteration of a fertilizer within the State. Provides that the Director of the Department of Agriculture may refuse to register a fertilizer or cancel or suspend a fertilizer registration, custom blend, or fertilizer if certain specified claims are made. Permits the Director to issue and serve a written stop sale, stop use, or regulate removal upon an owner, operator, manager, or agent in charge of fertilizer. Creates the Nutrient Research and Education Council (NREC) for the purpose of pursuing nutrient research and providing educational programs to ensure the adoption and implementation of practices that optimize nutrient use efficiency, ensure soil fertility, and address environmental concerns with regard to fertilizer use. Provides that the Department has the authority issue subpoenas, temporary restraining orders, preliminary or permanent injunctions against any person from violating or continuing to violate any provision of the Act. Provides for penalties based on type of violation. Makes other corresponding changes. Effective January 1, 2012.
Title
AGRIC-FERTILIZER AND BLENDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 In line by 3PM. Timely filed in accordance with House Rule 18(e) |
2011-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2011-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz |
2011-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2011-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Frerichs |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture and Conservation; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation |
2011-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2011 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation |
2011-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
505 | 80 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 18a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 21.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
505 | 80 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 6b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
505 | 80 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |