IL SB2022 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Permits a person to request and vote an absentee ballot without specifying a reason for the absence from the polling place on election day. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTIONS-ABSENTEE VOTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-17 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0553 | |
2009-08-17 | Effective Date August 17, 2009 | |
2009-08-17 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-20 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-048-000 | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-18 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-05 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 006-003-000 | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Frerichs | |
2009-04-01 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Elections; 005-000-000 | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Elections | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass Elections; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Elections | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |