IL SB2024 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0735
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0735
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clerks of Courts Act. Provides that the fine for speeding in a school zone is increased by $5 which shall go to the school district or districts in which the offense occurred. Provides that a county with a drug court may adopt a mandatory fee of $5 to fund the drug court, less a 5% clerk processing charge, assessed against any defendant found guilty in a traffic case or who is ordered to pay a fine under the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a person found guilty, including court supervision, of a DUI in addition to any other fine is fined $500, or $1,000 for other than a first offense, payable to the clerk to be distributed as follows: $100 to the law enforcement agency or agencies that made the arrest and $400 to the General Revenue Fund. Provides that when a person has been adjudged guilty of a DUI and a crime lab DUI analysis was completed, in addition to any other disposition or fine, a crime lab DUI analysis fee of $150 shall be paid by the defendant. Provides that the court may suspend payment of the fee if the defendant does not have the ability to pay. Provides that if the fine assessed for a first offense of speeding in a construction zone is $250 or greater, there shall be an additional $125 fee paid by the defendant, which shall be deposited into the Transportation Safety Highway Hire-back Fund. Provides for other related changes.
Title
COURT CLERK FEE DISBURSEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0735 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-012-000 | |
2009-05-29 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-28 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-28 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-22 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-05-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-05-22 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-05-22 | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009 | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-004-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 2, 2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Schoenberg | |
2009-04-01 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |