IL SB2025 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that the Division of Professional Regulation of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation is prohibited from expending any funds to enforce any rule that requires a person or pharmacy to dispense emergency contraception medication.
Title
PHARMACY PRACT-RULE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-11 | Held in Public Health | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2025&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2025.htm |