IL SB2025 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires each school district to inform a student's parent or guardian if his or her child is beginning to receive tiered Response to Intervention support that is more intensive than the universal level of instruction and must allow the parent or guardian to participate in the process; defines "Response to Intervention". Provides that the information provided to the parent or guardian must include the problem or problems being addressed for the student, the student's performance goal or goals, the reason why the student is being moved to a more intense level of intervention, and how the parent or guardian may obtain a copy of any progress reports and data being collected for the student. Provides that a school district must inform a parent or guardian with a child who is receiving Response to Intervention support above the universal level of instruction of the parent's or guardian's right to request a special education evaluation at any time. Requires a school district to request parental or guardian consent to conduct a case study evaluation of a student to determine if the student is in need of special education services if the student has been in the highest level of Response to Intervention support for 45 consecutive school days and has not shown meaningful, measurable progress under the performance goal or goals established for the student. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHCD-RESPONSE TO INTERVENTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |