IL SB2059 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act, the Illinois Fire Protection Training Act, and the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board, the Office of the State Fire Marshal, and the Department of Public Health shall develop training programs for law enforcement personnel, fire fighters, and EMTs, respectively, regarding the risks associated with autism and appropriate autism recognition and response techniques. Requires that persons serving in those capacities on the effective date of the amendatory Act must satisfactorily complete a training course within 18 months after that date. Effective immediately.
Title
POLICE-FIRE-EMT-AUTISM-TRAIN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-11 | To Public Health Subcommittee on Special Issues | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2059&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2059.htm |