IL SB2059 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Control Act. Provides that, if a bite occurs from an exempt animal, the exempt animal shall be treated as an unvaccinated animal and, if a rabies titer has been administered, the animal will be treated as a vaccinated animal. Provides that, if the animal is exempt, the animal shall be re-examined by a licensed veterinarian on no less than an annual basis and be vaccinated against rabies as soon as the animal's health permits or if deemed necessary by a rabies titer.
Title
ANIMALS-RABIES INOCULATION
Sponsors
Sen. John Curran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2059&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2059.htm |