IL SB2086 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that no later than October 1, 2022, the Department of Human Services shall transfer each individual with an intellectual disability or a developmental disability residing in a non-Medicaid certified facility or residence funded by the Department to the State's Home and Community-Based Services Waiver Program for Persons with Developmental Disabilities or to a Medicaid-certified residence or facility. Prior to the transfer of any individual under this provision, the individual shall be evaluated by an independent community-based multidisciplinary clinical team that will work with the individual and an independent service coordination agency to develop a person-centered plan for the individual up to the amount of funding currently being allocated for the needs of the individual in the non-Medicaid certified facility or residence. Provides that the net savings realized from the implementation of this provision shall be reinvested in community-based residential and support services to individuals with intellectual disabilities and developmental disabilities. Amends the Community Services Act to make conforming changes.
Title
DEVELOPMENTALLY DISABLED-RES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
405 | 30 | 4.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2086&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2086.htm |