IL SB2097 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: (1) removes provisions concerning the redemption period for abandoned or blighted property; (2) in provisions concerning the purchase of delinquent property by the county, provides that the county may take steps to maintain the property, mow the grass or remove nuisance greenery, remove garbage, waste, debris, or other materials, or demolish, repair, or remediate unsafe structures (in the introduced bill, those activities were listed as components of "maintaining the property"); and (3) in provisions concerning sales in error, removes provisions providing that the request to waive amounts owed to a county, city, village, or town must be denied or not acted upon for a period of 90 days, and provides that court may not grant a sale in error for the property if the liens owed to a county, city, village, or town have been released within 60 days of the purchaser's request.
Title
PROP TX-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Stadelman |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Stadelman |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |