IL SB2196 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Modifies a Section concerning moneys in the Audit Expense Fund to provide for the transfer of moneys from specified funds into the Audit Expense Fund. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-AUDIT EXPENSE FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-01-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-05 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-06-02 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |