IL SB2200 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates the sum of $200,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to reimburse an eligible electric utility serving adversely impacted residential and small commercial customers. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$DCEO-UTILITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Appropriations |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Erica Harriss |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2200&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/PDF/10300SB2200.pdf |