IL SB2246 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that township land commissioners or trustees of schools that have title to any school real estate or lands may authorize by resolution the sale of common school lands to a government entity if two-thirds of the township land commissioners or trustees of schools approve the resolution. Provides that the regional superintendent of schools of the county in which the lands are located shall complete the sale and deliver a certificate of purchase to the government entity. Provides that a government entity that purchases common school lands, or its assigns, may obtain a copy of a certificate of purchase or patent by (1) for a certificate of purchase, filing an affidavit with the regional superintendent in which the lands are located proving the loss or destruction of the original; (2) for a patent, filing an affidavit with the Secretary of State proving loss or destruction of the original; and (3) presenting a copy of the certified resolution approving the sale that has been filed by the township land commissioners or trustees of schools with the county recorder of deeds to the regional superintendent or Secretary of State. Provides that the regional superintendent or the Secretary of State shall issue a replacement certificate or patent, which shall have the effect of the originals and shall reflect the effective date of the transfer of title as the date of the filing of the resolution by the township land commissioners or trustees of schools with the county recorder of deeds. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SCHOOL LAND-GOVT ENTITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-02-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 13, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-10-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 15-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 15-7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |