IL SB2273 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that the Department of Transportation must grant a request for initial or subsequent installation or removal of automated traffic law enforcement system equipment within 60 days after the Department's receipt of the request, if the location, placement, or construction of the equipment conforms with the federal Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices adopted by the Department.
Title
HWY CD–IDOT-RED LIGHT CAMERAS
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 9-113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2273&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2273.htm |