IL SB2276 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the Legislative Ethics Commission shall adopt no rule requiring the Legislative Inspector General to seek the Commission's advance approval before commencing any investigation. Provides that any existing rule, as of the effective date of this amendatory Act, requiring the Legislative Inspector General to seek the Commission's advance approval before commencing any investigation is void. Effective immediately.
Title
LIG-ETHICS INVESTIGATIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] |
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 25-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2276&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2276.htm |