IL SB2316 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that, by October 1, 2022, the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency shall submit a report to the General Assembly containing its plan to replace the dismantled official inspection stations located in the City of Chicago. Provides that the plan shall consist of either a pilot program or a permanent replacement program, and shall provide information on the locations of the new stations within the City of Chicago, information on potential vendors that may best supply and manage such stations, and a target date for full operation of all stations. Provides that the Agency shall issue a request for proposals related to its plan by January 1, 2023. Provides that the described plan shall also contain a timeline of actions, shall include procurement of services, technology, equipment, and other elements necessary to replace the former vehicle testing lanes, and shall state whether the replacement stations in the City of Chicago will utilize permanent self-service kiosks. Provides that the plan shall also include the Agency's strategy of how best to inform people of the location and hours of operation of the new official inspection stations and conduct an informational campaign. Provides that any contracts given as a result of the plan shall adhere to State procurement requirements, and that the State shall consider contracting with minority-owned businesses. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-VEH INSPECTION STATION
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Mike Simmons [D] |
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 012-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Executive |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 13C-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |