IL SB2320 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that no State employee may receive monetary or other compensation from any private party for work performed within the scope of his or her employment by a State agency. Effective immediately.
Title
NO PRIVATE PAY FOR PUBLIC WORK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As June 23, 2020 |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 7, 2020 |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2320&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2320.htm |