IL SB2329 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Expressway Camera Act. Renames the Act to the Expressway and Highway Camera Act. Establishes that funds from the Illinois State Tollway Highway Authority may be used for installation and maintenance of the camera systems, telecommunications costs, data storage costs, and for camera warranties. Provides that cameras shall be interoperable with the Illinois State Police current camera system. Makes other changes. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that the provision exempting images from cameras under the Expressway and Highway Camera Act is inoperative on and after July 1, 2025 (rather than 2023). Effective immediately.
Title
EXPRESSWAY HIGHWAY CAMERA ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 140 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 140 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 140 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2329&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2329.htm |