IL SB2376 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Assessed Clean Energy Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
COOK WATER INFRASTRUCTURE FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 43 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 43 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2018-11-27 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Lost 068-042-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-15 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-11-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 056-002-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-001 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-043-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 011-008-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harris |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-001-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |