IL SB2401 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Labor Dispute Act. Provides that no award of monetary damages, except for damage done to an employer's property as a result of conduct prohibited by law, shall be granted by any court of this State in any case involving a labor dispute.
Title
LABOR DISPUTE-DAMAGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 005-002-000 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2401&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2401.htm |