IL SB2585 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0854
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0854
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Governor's Office of Management and Budget Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning intergovernmental cooperation.
Title
GOMB-ECONOMIC/FISCAL REPORT
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] |
Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0854 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date August 19, 2016 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 29, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2016-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-05-27 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-18 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-18 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2016-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-05-12 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; L. Murphy |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-001-000 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3005 | 2.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |