IL SB2612 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that by January 31 of each year, each election authority shall submit a form with specified information to the State Board of Elections. Provides that the Board, in coordination with advocacy groups, shall develop the form an election authority shall use to submit the specified information. Provides that the Board shall provide a way for an election authority to submit the form online, by mail, or by facsimile. Provides that the Board shall make the information collected available to the public on request.
Title
ELEC CD-ELECTION AUTHORITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |