IL SB2620 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0711
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0711
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Capital Development Board Act. Provides that the Capital Development Board shall maintain on its website links to all currently applicable State building codes. Requires State agencies that propose to adopt new building or construction requirements, or amendments to existing requirements, to report certain information to the Capital Development Board. Effective immediately.
Title
CDB-STATE BUILDING CODES
Sponsors
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] |
Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0711 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |